VA HB17 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill also removes a provision allowing the court to require a defendant to present a summary prepared by the Department of Motor Vehicles of the other courts in which the defendant also owes fines and costs. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2020, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs. Such person does not have to pay a reinstatement fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31HouseIncorporated by Courts of Justice
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1196-Lopez) by voice vote
2020-01-28HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101115D

Same As/Similar To

HB1196 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0964)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text
192354.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332503(n/a)See Bill Text
4621200.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462301(n/a)See Bill Text
462361(n/a)See Bill Text
462391.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462395(n/a)See Bill Text
462416(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback