UT SB0107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Computer Science Initiative for Public Schools
Title
Computer Science Initiative for Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-26 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-02-26 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-23 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-23 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-23 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |