UT SB0085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Truth in Advertising Amendments
Title
Truth in Advertising Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # Verbal in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-23 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |