UT SB0036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secondhand Sales Amendments
Title
Secondhand Sales Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2014-12-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |