UT HB0479 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hepatitis C Outreach Pilot Program
Title
Hepatitis C Outreach Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0479.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0479.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0479.fn.pdf |