US SR321 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 2019 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Title
A resolution designating September 2019 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608) |
Same As/Similar To
HR584 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR692 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
SR702 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
HR1118 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR692 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
SR702 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
HR1118 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/321/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres321/BILLS-116sres321ats.pdf |