US HR584 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 2019 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2019 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR321 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
SR692 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
SR702 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
HR1118 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR692 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
SR702 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
HR1118 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
Research administration and funding
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/584/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres584/BILLS-116hres584ih.pdf |