US SB872 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to restore, reaffirm, and reconcile environmental justice and civil rights, and for other purposes.
Title
Environmental Justice For All Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1415 (Related) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
HB2021 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.
SB1461 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2924 (Related) 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB9218 (Related) 2022-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2021 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.
SB1461 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2924 (Related) 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB9218 (Related) 2022-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s872/BILLS-117s872is.pdf |