US HB2924 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a program to award grants to entities that provide transportation connectors from critically underserved urban communities and rural communities to green spaces.
Title
Transit to Trails Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.
SB872 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1461 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB872 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1461 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2924/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2924/BILLS-117hr2924ih.pdf |