US HB1415 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 to authorize grants to Indian Tribes to further achievement of Tribal coastal zone objectives, and for other purposes.
Title
Tribal Coastal Resiliency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-564. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2021-06-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB872 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2021 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.
HB2021 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.