US HB9218 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Federal program of cumulative impact assessments under the Clean Water Act and Clean Air Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Cumulative Impacts Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2022-10-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-10-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-687, Part I.
SB872 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB872 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/9218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr9218/BILLS-117hr9218ih.pdf |