US SB4137 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for improvements to the rivers and harbors of the United States, to provide for the conservation and development of water and related resources, and for other purposes.
Title
Water Resources Development Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7198 (Related) 2022-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3610 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4136 (Related) 2022-06-22 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-124.
SB3215 (Related) 2021-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7762 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
SB4266 (Related) 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7950 (Related) 2022-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB4684 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8785 (Related) 2022-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB4695 (Related) 2022-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3610 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4136 (Related) 2022-06-22 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-124.
SB3215 (Related) 2021-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7762 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
SB4266 (Related) 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7950 (Related) 2022-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB4684 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8785 (Related) 2022-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB4695 (Related) 2022-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4137/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4137/BILLS-117s4137is.pdf |