US HB7762 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Act of August 10, 1956, to provide for the payment of pay and allowances for certain officers of the Army who are assigned to the Corps of Engineers.
Title
USACE Military Personnel Augmentation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291) |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3215 (Related) 2021-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4136 (Related) 2022-06-22 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-124.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB4136 (Related) 2022-06-22 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-124.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7762/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7762/BILLS-117hr7762ih.pdf |