US HB7950 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Water Resources Development Act of 1992 to increase funding for stormwater management for Atlanta, Georgia, and for other purposes.
Title
City of Atlanta Stormwater Management Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4266 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4266 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7950/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7950/BILLS-117hr7950ih.pdf |