CA AB2872 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19827.6 to the Government Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Department of Insurance: sworn members: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19827.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |