US SB3215 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Act of August 10, 1956, to provide for the payment of pay and allowances for certain officers of the Army who are assigned to the Corps of Engineers.
Title
USACE Military Personnel Augmentation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4136 (Related) 2022-06-22 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-124.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7762 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB4137 (Related) 2022-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7762 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5291)
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3215/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3215/BILLS-117s3215is.pdf |