US SB3544 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the visitor and education center at Fort McHenry National Monument and Historic Shrine as the "Paul S. Sarbanes Visitor and Education Center".
Title
A bill to designate the visitor and education center at Fort McHenry National Monument and Historic Shrine as the "Paul S. Sarbanes Visitor and Education Center".
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603. |
2024-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5999) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6826 (Related) 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-175.