US HB6826 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the visitor and education center at Fort McHenry National Monument and Historic Shrine as the Paul S. Sarbanes Visitor and Education Center.
Title
To designate the visitor and education center at Fort McHenry National Monument and Historic Shrine as the Paul S. Sarbanes Visitor and Education Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Glenn Ivey [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-175. |
2024-12-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7079) |
2024-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2024-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6270-6271) |
2024-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6826. |
2024-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6270-6273) |
2024-12-03 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 623. |
2024-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-738. |
2024-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3544 (Related) 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.