US SB3345 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to prohibit contributions and donations by foreign nationals in connection with ballot initiatives and referenda.
Title
Protecting Ballot Measures from Foreign Influence Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB6177 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Related) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB6177 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Related) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3345/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3345/BILLS-117s3345is.pdf |