US HB6177 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to prohibit contributions and donations by foreign nationals in connection with ballot initiatives and referenda.
Title
Protecting Ballot Measures From Foreign Influence Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2021-12-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Related) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3345 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Related) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3345 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6177/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6177/BILLS-117hr6177ih.pdf |