US HB1516 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to prohibit contributions and donations by foreign nationals in connection with State or local ballot initiatives or referenda.
Title
Stop Foreign Interference in Ballot Measures Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB1334 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB443 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Same As) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB6177 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3345 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1334 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB443 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
HB5841 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3136 (Same As) 2021-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB6177 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3345 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1516/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1516/BILLS-117hr1516ih.pdf |