US SB3254 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gun Violence Prevention and Community Safety Act of 2020 This bill makes various changes to the federal framework governing the sale, transfer, and possession of firearms and ammunition. Among other things, the bill does the following: generally requires individuals to obtain a license to purchase, acquire, or possess a firearm or ammunition; raises the minimum age—from 18 years to 21 years—to purchase firearms and ammunition; establishes new background check requirements for firearm transfers between private parties; requires law enforcement agencies to be notified following a firearms-related background check that results in a denial; creates a statutory process for a family or household member to petition a court for an extreme risk protection order to remove firearms from an individual who poses a risk of committing violence; restricts the import, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession of semiautomatic assault weapons and large capacity ammunition feeding devices; restricts the manufacture, sale, transfer, purchase, or receipt of ghost guns (i.e., guns without serial numbers); makes trafficking in firearms a stand-alone criminal offense; requires federally licensed gun dealers to submit and annually certify compliance with a security plan to detect and deter firearm theft; removes limitations on the civil liability of gun manufacturers; allows the Consumer Product Safety Commission to issue safety standards for firearms and firearm components; establishes a community violence intervention grant program; and promotes research on firearms safety and gun violence prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun Violence Prevention and Community Safety Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1186 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
HB1296 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1671 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2959 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3076 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3454 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3569 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4691 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB66 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S103-104)
SB447 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB875 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1943 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2014 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3065 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB569 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1115 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB1236 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
HB1266 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1670 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3553 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB506 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB730 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1395 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Assault and harassment offenses
Business records
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Mental health
Personnel records
Product safety and quality
Religion
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Smuggling and trafficking
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback