US SB42 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new background check requirements for firearm transfers between private parties (i.e., unlicensed individuals). Specifically, it prohibits a firearm transfer between private parties unless a licensed gun dealer, manufacturer, or importer first takes possession of the firearm to conduct a background check. The prohibition does not apply to certain firearm transfers, such as a gift between spouses in good faith.
Title
Background Check Expansion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
HR145 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1705 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6318 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1924 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR145 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1705 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6318 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1924 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s42/BILLS-116s42is.pdf |