US HB8 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 227-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new background check requirements for firearm transfers between private parties (i.e., unlicensed individuals). Specifically, it prohibits a firearm transfer between private parties unless a licensed gun dealer, manufacturer, or importer first takes possession of the firearm to conduct a background check. The prohibition does not apply to certain firearm transfers, such as a gift between spouses in good faith.
Title
Bipartisan Background Checks Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - On passage RC# 99 (Y: 240 N: 190 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 98 (Y: 220 N: 209 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - On agreeing to the Horn, Kendra S. amendment (A003) H.Amdt.46 RC# 97 (Y: 310 N: 119 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - On agreeing to the Lesko amendment (A001) H.Amdt.44 RC# 96 (Y: 182 N: 250 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 98 (Y: 220 N: 209 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - On agreeing to the Horn, Kendra S. amendment (A003) H.Amdt.46 RC# 97 (Y: 310 N: 119 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - On agreeing to the Lesko amendment (A001) H.Amdt.44 RC# 96 (Y: 182 N: 250 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-27 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 190 (Roll no. 99). |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.48 On agreeing to the Nadler amendment (A005) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.48 Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Nadler. (consideration: CR H2262; text: CR H2262) |
2019-02-27 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 209 (Roll no. 98). |
2019-02-27 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-02-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Collins (GA) motion to recommit with instructions pending a reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to insert new text on regulations in the case of a background check conducted by the national instant criminal background check system, in response to a contact from a licensed importer, manufacturer, or dealer, that the system notify U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement if the individual is in violation of subsection (g)(5). Subsequently, the reservation was withdrawn. |
2019-02-27 | House | Mr. Collins (GA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2260) |
2019-02-27 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text: CR H2254) |
2019-02-27 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-02-27 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 8. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.46 On agreeing to the Horn, Kendra S. amendment (A003) Agreed to by recorded vote: 310 - 119 (Roll no. 97). |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.44 On agreeing to the Lesko amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 182 - 250 (Roll no. 96). |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.47 On agreeing to the Van Drew amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-27 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Van Drew amendment No. 4. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.47 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Van Drew. (consideration: CR H2258-2259; text: CR H2258) |
2019-02-27 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Horn amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2019-02-27 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Horn (OK) amendment No. 3. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.46 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Horn, Kendra S.. (consideration: CR H2257-2258, H2260; text: CR H2257) |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.45 On agreeing to the Dean amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-27 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Dean amendment No. 2. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.45 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Dean. (consideration: CR H2256-2257; text: CR H2256) |
2019-02-27 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Lesko amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Lesko demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2019-02-27 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lesko amendment No. 1. |
2019-02-27 | House | H.Amdt.44 Amendment (A001) offered by Mrs. Lesko. (consideration: CR H2254-2256, H2259; text: CR H2254) |
2019-02-27 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 8. |
2019-02-27 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Earl Blumenauer to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2019-02-27 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 145 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-02-27 | House | Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. |
2019-02-27 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 145. (consideration: CR H2242-2263) |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 145 Reported to House. Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. |
2019-02-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-11. |
2019-02-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15. |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR145 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1705 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1924 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR145 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1705 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1924 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades