US HB1705 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jaime's Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jaime's Law

Sponsors

Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB8 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1924 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback