US HB6318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urban Progress Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Progress Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1114 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB1116 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB730 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2036 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4634; text: CR S4634-4635)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback