US HB3076 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 103-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the issuance of extreme risk protection orders.
Title
Federal Extreme Risk Protection Order Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4223) |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Due process and equal protection
Firearms and explosives
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Due process and equal protection
Firearms and explosives
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3076/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3076/BILLS-116hr3076ih.pdf |