US SB1943 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to regulate firearm silencers and firearm mufflers.
Title
HEAR Act Help Empower Americans to Respond Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3454 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Trade restrictions
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1943/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1943/BILLS-116s1943is.pdf |