US HB1186 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Keep Americans Safe Act This bill establishes a new criminal offense for the import, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession of a large capacity ammunition feeding device (LCAFD). The bill does not prohibit certain conduct with respect to an LCAFD, including the following: importation, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession related to certain law enforcement efforts, or authorized tests or experiments; importation, sale, transfer, or possession related to securing nuclear materials; and possession by a retired law enforcement officer. The bill permits continued possession of, but prohibits sale or transfer of, a grandfathered LCAFD. Newly manufactured LCAFDs must display serial number identification and the date of manufacture. Additionally, the bill allows a state or local government to use Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program funds to compensate individuals who surrender an LCAFD under a buy-back program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Americans Safe Act

Sponsors

Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB282 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB66 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S103-104)
SB447 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1296 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback