US SB1305 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CBP HiRe Act U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill provides hiring and compensation flexibilities to support the recruitment, relocation, and retention of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) employees in rural or remote areas. Specifically, if the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) determines there is a critical hiring need and a direct relationship between the rural or remote nature of an area and the difficulty recruiting and retaining CBP employees in that area, then it may exercise direct hire authority and pay recruitment, relocation, and retention bonuses. Additionally, the Office of Personnel Management may establish special pay rates. The DHS Office of Inspector General must review the use of hiring and compensation flexibilities and determine whether they help meet hiring and retention needs in rural and remote areas. DHS must report to Congress on the number of requests it receives from other federal agencies for the file of an applicant for a position in the CBP that includes the results of a polygraph examination.
Title
CBP HiRe Act U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-10-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6774-6775; text: CR S6774-6775) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 447. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-270. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3329-3330) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Commuting
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Personnel records
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Commuting
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Personnel records
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation