US SB3478 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FAMILIES Act Fixing America's Marred Immigration Laws to Improve and Ensure Security
Title
FAMILIES Act Fixing America's Marred Immigration Laws to Improve and Ensure Security
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB505 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2213 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2595 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB5869 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6181 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6190 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB146 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 379.
SB595 (Related) 2017-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
SB1208 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Held at the desk.
SB1305 (Related) 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SB3093 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
HB2213 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2595 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB5869 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6181 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6190 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB146 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 379.
SB595 (Related) 2017-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
SB1208 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Held at the desk.
SB1305 (Related) 2018-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SB3093 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3478/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3478/BILLS-115s3478is.pdf |