US SB1102 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eastern Mediterranean Security and Energy Partnership Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eastern Mediterranean Security and Energy Partnership Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
2019-07-10SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-06-25SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-04-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB922 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2913 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2512 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3263 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Accidents
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
Bulgaria
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Cyprus
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government lending and loan guarantees
Greece
Higher education
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Internet and video services
Israel
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Transportation safety and security
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Visas and passports
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback