US HB2512 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the transfer of an F-35 aircraft to Turkey and various activities related to such a transfer. The prohibition may be waived if the President certifies to Congress that Turkey does not intend to accept delivery of the S-400 air defense system, which Turkey has agreed to buy from Russia.
Title
Protecting NATO Skies Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB922 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2913 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3263 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2913 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3263 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Asia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2512/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2512/BILLS-116hr2512ih.pdf |