US HB2913 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-16)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of State to enter into cooperative agreements to enhance cooperation on energy matters between the United States and Israel, Greece, and Cyprus. The Department of Energy may establish a joint U.S.-Eastern Mediterranean Energy Center in the United States to further dialogue and academic cooperation in energy innovation technology, water science, and technology transfer. An existing ban on transferring defense articles and services on the U.S. Munitions List to Cyprus is modified to allow for such transfers if Cyprus is the end user of the articles or services. Specifically, the State Department shall not deny exports, reexports or transfers of defense articles and services to or from Cyprus if the request is made by or on behalf of Cyprus and if Cyprus is the end user of such articles or services. No funds may be obligated or expended to facilitate the transfer of an F-35 aircraft (or to provide any related items or data) to Turkey unless the President certifies to Congress that Turkey does not plan to accept delivery of the S-400 air defense system from Russia. The State Department shall report on (1) a strategy for enhancing security and energy cooperation with Eastern Mediterranean countries, (2) malign Russian influence in the region, and (3) violations of Cyprus's exclusive economic zone and Greece's sovereign territory in the Aegean Sea.
Title
Eastern Mediterranean Security and Energy Partnership Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2512 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB922 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
HB4558 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB922 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
HB4558 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Asia
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Central Europe
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Cultural exchanges and relations
Cyprus
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Greece
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public-private cooperation
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Alternative and renewable resources
Asia
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Central Europe
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Cultural exchanges and relations
Cyprus
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Greece
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public-private cooperation
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2913/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2913/BILLS-116hr2913ih.pdf |