US HR904 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the engrossment of H.B. 6201 (Families First Coronavirus Response Act), including modifications to provisions regarding requirements and tax credits for paid sick leave.
Title
Directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the engrossment of H.B. 6201.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-16 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1698-1707) |
2020-03-16 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1698-1707) |
2020-03-16 | House | RESERVATION OF OBJECTION - Mr. Gohmert reserved the right to object. Subsequently, his reservation was withdrawn. |
2020-03-16 | House | Without objection, the Chair laid before the House H. Res. 904. |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
HB6213 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6273 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6261 (Related) 2020-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HR1107 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6213 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6273 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6261 (Related) 2020-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HR1107 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Legislative rules and procedure
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/904/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres904/BILLS-116hres904eh.pdf |