US HR1107 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2574) to amend title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to restore the right to individual civil actions in cases involving disparate impact, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2639) to establish the Strength in Diversity Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2694) to eliminate discrimination and promote women's health and economic security by ensuring reasonable workplace accommodations for workers whose ability to perform the functions of a job are limited by pregnancy, childbirth, or a related medical condition; providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 908) condemning all forms of anti-Asian sentiment as related to COVID-19; and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2574) to amend title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to restore the right to individual civil actions in cases involving disparate impact, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2639) to establish the Strength in Diversity Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2694) to eliminate discrimination and promote women's health and economic security by ensuring reasonable workplace accommodations for workers whose ability to perform the functions of a job are limited by pregnancy, childbirth, or a related medical condition; providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 908) condemning all forms of anti-Asian sentiment as related to COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2574) to amend title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to restore the right to individual civil actions in cases involving disparate impact, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2639) to establish the Strength in Diversity Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2694) to eliminate discrimination and promote women's health and economic security by ensuring reasonable workplace accommodations for workers whose ability to perform the functions of a job are limited by pregnancy, childbirth, or a related medical condition; providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 908) condemning all forms of anti-Asian sentiment as related to COVID-19; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-15 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 216 N: 157 NV: 0 Abs: 57) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 219 N: 170 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-15HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 157 (Roll no. 186). (text: CR H4391-4392)
2020-09-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4399-4400)
2020-09-15HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the resolution until a time to be announced.
2020-09-15HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 170 (Roll no. 185).
2020-09-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1107.
2020-09-15HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4391-4399)
2020-09-14HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 93.
2020-09-14HouseProvides for one hour of debate on each measure. The previous question will be considered as ordered on each measure without intervening motions except for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2574, H.R. 2639, and H.R. 2694.
2020-09-14HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-502, by Ms. Scanlon.

Same As/Similar To

HB2574 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1107 (Similar To) 2020-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2639 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2694 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR904 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR908 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback