US HB2574 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Equity and Inclusion Enforcement Act of 2019 This bill authorizes private civil causes of action for disparate impact violations (to the same extent as intentional violations) of federal regulations of general applicability that prohibit discrimination on the ground of race, color, or national origin in programs or activities receiving federal financial assistance. Anti-Semitism shall be considered to be discrimination on the basis of race, color, or national origin. Education programs that receive financial assistance authorized or extended by the Department of Education (ED) must designate at least one compliance coordinator to carry out these nondiscrimination responsibilities and investigate complaints. The bill requires ED to appoint a Special Assistant for Equity and Inclusion to (1) promote, coordinate, and evaluate efforts to engender program compliance and inform individuals of their rights; and (2) advise ED on matters relating to compliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equity and Inclusion Enforcement Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - House - On passage (Y: 232 N: 188 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions (Y: 255 N: 164 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2020-09-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-16HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 188 (Roll no. 192).
2020-09-16HouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on passage of H.R. 2574, which was debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
2020-09-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4474-4475)
2020-09-16HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate, the Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 2574, and announced by voice vote that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx (NC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
2020-09-16HouseH.Amdt.882 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
2020-09-16HouseH.Amdt.882 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H4473-4474; text: CR H4443)
2020-09-16HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 255 - 164 (Roll no. 191).
2020-09-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4473-4474)
2020-09-16HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Foxx (NC) motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx (NC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
2020-09-16HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2020-09-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Foxx (NC) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add antisemitism as a designation to be considered discrimination under title VI of the bill.
2020-09-16HouseMs. Foxx (NC) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Education and Labor. (text: CR H4443)
2020-09-16HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-09-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2574.
2020-09-16HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2574, H.R. 2639, H.R. 2694 and H. Res. 908. Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The previous question will be considered as ordered on each measure without intervening motions except for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2574, H.R. 2639, and H.R. 2694.
2020-09-16HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1107. (consideration: CR H4439-4444)
2020-09-14HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1107 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2574, H.R. 2639, H.R. 2694 and H. Res. 908. Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The previous question will be considered as ordered on each measure without intervening motions except for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2574, H.R. 2639, and H.R. 2694.
2020-09-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 116-495, Part I.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-05-16HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 20.
2019-05-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1107 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback