US HB6213 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires private health insurance plans to cover testing for COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) without imposing cost sharing for the duration of the public health emergency declared on January 31, 2020. This includes the cost of administering such approved tests and visits to health care providers for testing.
Title
No Cost for COVID–19 Testing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
HR904 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3499 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR904 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3499 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6213/BILLS-116hr6213ih.pdf |