US HR450 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the historical significance and supports the continued celebration of Juneteenth Independence Day, which commemorates the end of slavery in the United States.
Title
Recognizing June 19, 2019, as this year's observance of the historical significance of Juneteenth Independence Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR448 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR253 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3836; text: CR S3850)
HR1001 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR620 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)
SR253 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3836; text: CR S3850)
HR1001 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR620 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/450/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres450/BILLS-116hres450ih.pdf |