US HR1339 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of May as National Foster Care Month.
Title
Expressing support for designation of May as National Foster Care Month and acknowledging the responsibility that Congress has to promote safety, well-being, improved outcomes, and permanency for the Nation's collective children.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Bean [D-IL] | Rep. Dennis Cardoza [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. John Linder [R-GA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 5/19/2010 H3610-3611) | |
2010-05-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3682) | |
2010-05-19 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McDermott objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-05-19 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1339. | |
2010-05-19 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3610-3612; text of measure as introduced: CR H3610-3611) | |
2010-05-19 | Mr. McDermott moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HR391 (Related) 2009-05-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.