US HR1059 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-7)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Honors the bravery and dedication of the United States Agency for International Development (USAID), Office of U.S. Foreign Disaster Assistance, and Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) supported urban search and rescue teams. Congratulates U.S. urban search and rescue workers for the lives they helped save in Haiti. Recognizes the contribution of these teams in the lives they directly saved, to the international teams they trained, and to the people of Haiti. Expresses gratitude to the individuals and organizations that comprise the National Urban Search and Rescue System for their work as first responders to victims of disasters.
Title
Honoring the heroism of the seven United States Agency for International Development, Office of U.S. Foreign Disaster Assistance, and Federal Emergency Management Agency supported urban search and rescue teams deployed to Haiti from New York City, New York, Fairfax County, Virginia, Los Angeles County, California, the City of Miami, Florida, Miami-Dade County, Florida, and Virginia Beach, Virginia, and commending their dedication and assistance in the aftermath of the January 12, 2010, Haitian earthquake.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-02-23 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 53). (text: CR H671-672) | |
2010-02-23 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H697) | |
2010-02-23 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-02-23 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1059. | |
2010-02-23 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H671-673) | |
2010-02-23 | Mr. McMahon moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House Foreign Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1021 (Related) 2010-01-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
California
Caribbean area
Congressional tributes
Disaster relief and insurance
Florida
Foreign aid and international relief
Haiti
Latin America
Natural disasters
New York City
Virginia