US HB982 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an office within the Federal Trade Commission to prevent fraud targeting seniors, and for other purposes.
Title
Seniors Fraud Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB349 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1215 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1215 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/982/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr982/BILLS-117hr982ih.pdf |