US HB7301 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency Housing Protections and Relief Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Housing Protections and Relief Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - On passage RC# 128 (Y: 232 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 127 (Y: 191 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-29HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 180 (Roll no. 128). (text: CR H2644-2653)
2020-06-29HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 191 - 219 (Roll no. 127).
2020-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2667-2668)
2020-06-29HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Huizenga demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further consideration on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
2020-06-29HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2020-06-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add language with new directions on groups to receive funds as well as adding a new title.
2020-06-29HouseMr. Huizenga moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H2661-2662)
2020-06-29HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-06-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7301.
2020-06-29HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-29HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H2644-2663)
2020-06-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6362 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6704 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6724 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6729 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6736 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HB6820 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6859 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB7084 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3685 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
American Samoa
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Bankruptcy
Building construction
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Financial services and investments
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Guam
Health promotion and preventive care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Internet and video services
Landlord and tenant
Lighting, heating, cooling
Low- and moderate-income housing
Neighborhood Reinvestment Corporation
Northern Mariana Islands
Public housing
Public utilities and utility rates
Puerto Rico
Rural conditions and development
Securities
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback