US HR1017 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 51) to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1425) to amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for a Improve Health Insurance Affordability Fund to provide for certain reinsurance payments to lower premiums in the individual health insurance market; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5332) to amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to ensure that consumer reporting agencies are providing fair and accurate information reporting in consumer reports, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7120) to hold law enforcement accountable for misconduct in court, improve transparency through data collection, and reform police training and policies; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7301) to prevent evictions, foreclosures, and unsafe housing conditions resulting from the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 90) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency relating to "Community Reinvestment Act Regulations"; and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 51) to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1425) to amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for a Improve Health Insurance Affordability Fund to provide for certain reinsurance payments to lower premiums in the individual health insurance market; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5332) to amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to ensure that consumer reporting agencies are providing fair and accurate information reporting in consumer reports, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7120) to hold law enforcement accountable for misconduct in court, improve transparency through data collection, and reform police training and policies; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7301) to prevent evictions, foreclosures, and unsafe housing conditions resulting from the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 90) 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency relating to "Community Reinvestment Act Regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 51) to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1425) to amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for a Improve Health Insurance Affordability Fund to provide for certain reinsurance payments to lower premiums in the individual health insurance market; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5332) to amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to ensure that consumer reporting agencies are providing fair and accurate information reporting in consumer reports, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7120) to hold law enforcement accountable for misconduct in court, improve transparency through data collection, and reform police training and policies; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 7301) to prevent evictions, foreclosures, and unsafe housing conditions resulting from the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 90) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency relating to "Community Reinvestment Act Regulations"; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 117 (Y: 230 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 116 (Y: 231 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-25HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 180 (Roll no. 117). (text: CR H2430-2431)
2020-06-25HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 176 (Roll no. 116). (consideration: CR H2438)
2020-06-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1017.
2020-06-25HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2430-2439)
2020-06-24HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 81.
2020-06-24HouseThe resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-24HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-436, by Mr. Hastings.

Same As/Similar To

HB51 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Received in the Senate.
HB1425 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5332 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HB7120 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HJR90 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR967 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1053 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback