US HB6820 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 159-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency Rental Assistance and Rental Market Stabilization Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Rental Assistance and Rental Market Stabilization Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2020-05-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3685 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback