US HB6724 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Health Emergency Shelter Act of 2020 This bill authorizes additional grants under the Emergency Solutions Grants program to assist individuals and families experiencing a housing crisis or homelessness and to otherwise address needs arising from the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health Emergency Shelter Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2020-05-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6362 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HB6321 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3856 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback