US HB6736 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes additional rental assistance to low-income individuals and families residing in certain rural housing.
Title
Protect Rural Renters Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Rural conditions and development
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6736/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6736/BILLS-116hr6736ih.pdf |