US HB6729 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Homeowner Assistance Fund to provide funds to State housing finance agencies for the purpose of preventing homeowner mortgage defaults, foreclosures, and displacements of individuals and families experiencing financial hardship, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID-19 Homeowner Assistance Fund Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
American Samoa
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Guam
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Landlord and tenant
Lighting, heating, cooling
Northern Mariana Islands
Public utilities and utility rates
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
American Samoa
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Guam
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Landlord and tenant
Lighting, heating, cooling
Northern Mariana Islands
Public utilities and utility rates
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6729/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6729/BILLS-116hr6729ih.pdf |