US HB6757 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Family Savings Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Savings Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - House - On passage RC# 411 (Y: 240 N: 177 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-09-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-27HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 177 (Roll no. 411). (text: CR H9118-9126)
2018-09-27HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-09-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6757.
2018-09-27HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6756, H.R. 6757 and H.R. 6760.
2018-09-27HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1084. (consideration: CR H9118-9134)
2018-09-26HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1084 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6756, H.R. 6757 and H.R. 6760.
2018-09-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 747.
2018-09-24HouseCommittee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
2018-09-24HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-959, Part I.
2018-09-13HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
2018-09-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-09-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB854 (Related) 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1962 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2341 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3136 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4862 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6767 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB674 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB852 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1379 (Related) 2017-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2222 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7976)
HR1084 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback