NJ A2812 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5294
Note: Carry Over of previous S1825
Note: Carry Over of previous S1825
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Substituted by S721 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Substituted by S721 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts sales of investment metal bullion and investment coins from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempts sales of investment metal bullion and investment coins from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Kevin Egan [D] | Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] |
Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Substituted by S721 (2R) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5294 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1825 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5294 (1R)
S721 (Same As) 2024-09-12 - Approved P.L.2024, c.64.
S1825 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5294 (1R)
S721 (Same As) 2024-09-12 - Approved P.L.2024, c.64.